Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-5179
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-5179
Title:Arnes Becirovic, Petitioner
v.
Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:July 24, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-1353)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 23, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2023Waiver of right of respondent Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Arnes Becirovic
    Counsel of Record
5913 Kiverton Ridge Dr.
Grand Rapids, MI 49508

(616) 258-4973
Party name: Arnes Becirovic
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543