Docket for 23-51
 | |
|
May 09 2023 | Application (22A984) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2023 to June 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 11 2023 | Application (22A984) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 15, 2023. | | | Jun 02 2023 | Application (22A984) to extend further the time from June 15, 2023 to July 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Jun 08 2023 | Application (22A984) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 17, 2023. | | | Jul 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 21 2023 | Brief of respondents LePage Bakeries Park St., LLC, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Sep 05 2023 | Reply of petitioners Neal Bissonnette, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Sep 29 2023 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Nov 13 2023 | Brief of petitioners Neal Bissonnette, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 13 2023 | Joint appendix filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 15 2023 | Brief amici curiae of National Employment Law Project, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 15 2023 | Amicus brief of National Employment Law Project and National Employment Lawyers Association submitted. | | Main Document | Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Illinois et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
|