Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-500
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-500
Title:James Gimenez, Petitioner
v.
Franklin County, Washington, et al.
Docketed:November 14, 2023
Linked with 23A206
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(100999-2)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2023Application (23A206) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 13, 2023 to October 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Sep 01 2023Application (23A206) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 13, 2023.
Sep 21 2023Application (23A206) to extend further the time from October 13, 2023 to November 7, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written Request
Sep 26 2023Application (23A206) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 7, 2023.
Nov 07 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2023Waiver of right of respondents League of United Latin American Citizens, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 28 2023Response Requested. (Due January 29, 2024)
Jan 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2024 to February 28, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2024.
Feb 28 2024Brief of respondents League of United Latin American Citizens, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2024Reply of petitioner James Gimenez filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryan Kipp Weir
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

bryan@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: James Gimenez
Attorneys for Respondents
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
UCLA Voting Rights Project
3250 Public Affairs Building
Los Angeles, CA 90095

chad@uclavrp.org
512-717-9822
Party name: League of United Latin American Citizens; Gabriel Portugal; Jose Trinidad-Corral; Brandon Morales
Other
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Project on Fair Representation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543