Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-477
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-477
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al.
Docketed:November 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5600)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2023)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2023 to January 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Elliot Page, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2024 to February 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Alabama filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2024Brief of respondents Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.
Mar 13 2024Rescheduled.
Mar 18 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024.
Mar 20 2024Rescheduled.
Mar 25 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024.
Mar 26 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 11 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 18 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 22 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 25 2024Rescheduled.
May 06 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
May 08 2024Rescheduled.
May 13 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.
Jun 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
Jun 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 16 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al.
Steven James GriffinTennessee Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

steven.griffin@ag.tn.gov
6157419598
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al.
Jeffrey Matthew HarrisConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

JEFF@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al.
James Matthew RiceOffice of Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

MATT.RICE@AG.TN.GOV
615-532-6026
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al.
Other
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen and Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
212-225-2508
Party name: Elliot Page, et al.
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

andrew.davies@wilmerhale.com
212 230 8800
Party name: Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: America First Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543