SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-463
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-463
Title:
Elizabeth Brokamp, Petitioner
v.
Letitia James, Attorney General of New York, et al.
Docketed:
November 2, 2023
Linked with 23A109
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-3050)
Decision Date:
April 27, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
June 1, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2023
Application (23A109) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2023 to October 29, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Aug 10 2023
Application (23A109) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 30, 2023.
Oct 30 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 28 2023
Waiver of right of respondent Letitia James, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 04 2023
Brief amicus curiae of Professor Morris M. Kleiner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203
jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Elizabeth Brokamp
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400
BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: Letitia James, et al.
Other
Rebecca Caroline Furdek
Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
511 North Broadway, Suite 1100
Milwaukee, WI 53703
rebecca.furdek@huschblackwell.com
414-273-2100
Party name: Professor Morris M. Kleiner
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##