Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-456
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-456
Title:Consumers' Research, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:October 31, 2023
Linked with 23A88
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3886)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 30, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2023Application (23A88) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2023 to October 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 01 2023Application (23A88) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 27, 2023.
Oct 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2024, for all respondents.
Nov 22 2023Motion of Schools, Health & Libraries Broadband Coalition, et al. to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2024, for all respondents.
Nov 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2024 to February 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 1, 2024, for all respondents.
Jan 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 4, 2024, for all respondents.
Feb 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to April 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2024, for all respondents.
Mar 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2024 to May 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2024, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

tmccotter@boydengray.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Consumers' Research, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jason Edward Neal
    Counsel of Record
HWG LLP
1919 M Street NW
8th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

jneal@hwglaw.com
202-796-0994
Party name: Schools, Health & Libraries Broadband Coalition
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: FCC, et al.
Jennifer Beth Tatel
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Barker Knauer LLP
1800 M Street NW
Suite 800N
Washington, DC 20036

JTATEL@WBKLAW.COM
2023833344
Party name: USTelecom – The Broadband Association; National Telecommunications Cooperative Association d/b/a NTCA – The Rural Broadband Association; Competitive Carriers Association
Other
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
    Counsel of Record
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
525 9th Street NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20004

andyschwartzman@gmail.com
2022412408
Party name: Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, National Digital Inclusion Alliance, Center for Media Justice dba MediaJustice
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
1500 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

CBARTHOLD@TECHFREEDOM.ORG
7712004997
Party name: TechFreedom
Jeffrey Steven Beelaert
    Counsel of Record
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
2000 K Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

jbeelaert@steinmitchell.com
(202) 737-7777
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute, Free State Foundation, Christopher C. DeMuth, Harold Furchtgott-Roth, Michael S. Greve, Randolph J. May
Markham Sterling Chenoweth
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

MARK.CHENOWETH@NCLA.ONMICROSOFT.COM
2028695210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
4201 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 1000
Arlington, VA 22203

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543