Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-455
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-455
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Litsson Antonio Perez-Gallan
Docketed:October 31, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-51019)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 30 2023Brief of respondent Litsson Antonio Perez-Gallan in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Litsson Antonio Perez-Gallan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Shane O'Neal
    Counsel of Record
O'Neal Law
101 E. Avenue B
Alpine, TX 79830

SHANE@SHANEONEALLAW.COM
7135163505
Party name: Litsson Antonio Perez-Gallan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543