Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-449
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-449
Title:Aisha Trimble, Petitioner
v.
Department of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:October 30, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-1307)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2023Motion (23M28) for leave to proceed as a veteran filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2023)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 04 2023MOTION (23M28) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023Motion (23M28) for leave to proceed as a veteran Granted.
Nov 20 2023Waiver of right of respondent Department of Veterans Affairs to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 08 2024Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aisha TrimbleP.O. Box 540261
Dallas, TX 75354

(214) 962-8398
Party name: Aisha Trimble
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Veterans Affairs

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543