Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-411
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-411
Title:Vivek H. Murthy, Surgeon General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Missouri, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2023
Linked with 23A243
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-30445)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2023Application (23A243) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Sep 14 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22-cv-01213, is hereby administratively stayed until 11:59 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, September 22, 2023. It is further ordered that any response to the application be filed on or before Wednesday, September 20, 2023, by 4 p.m. (EDT).
Sep 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Ohio filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Response to application from respondent Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Michael Benz filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Kennedy Plaintiffs filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Angela Reading filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Notice of Appearance by Interested Party and Notice of Related Case Captioned Richard Jackson v. Twitter, Inc.; Notice of Intent to File Amicus Brief of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (October 13, 2023)
Sep 21 2023Reply of applicant Vivek H. Murthy, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Sep 22 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: Upon further consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants, the response, and the reply filed thereto, it is ordered that the stay issued on September 14, 2023, is hereby extended until 11:59 p.m. (EDT) on Wednesday, September 27, 2023.
Sep 25 2023Supplemental Letter from Missouri, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 26 2023Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application For A Stay filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 26 2023Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application For A Stay filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 26 2023Letter to the Clerk filed by Missouri, et al.
Main Document
Oct 03 2023Supplemental Letter from Missouri, et al. filed.
Main Document
Oct 05 2023Third Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application for a Stay filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 06 2023Amicus brief of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (corrected copy to be submitted by counsel)(October 13, 2023)
Oct 06 2023Notice and Opposition to Stay Request of Michael Eugene Reznick not accepted for filing. (October 13, 2023)
Oct 10 2023Response to Applicants' Third Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Application for a Stay of Injunction filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 13 2023Order issued by Justice Alito: Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicant, the response, and the reply filed thereto, it is ordered that the preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22-cv-01213, is hereby administratively stayed until 5 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, October 20, 2023.
Oct 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Michael Eugene Reznick filed.
Main Document
Oct 20 2023Application (23A243) referred to the Court.
Oct 20 2023Application (23A243) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted. The preliminary injunction issued on July 4, 2023, by the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, case No. 3:22–cv–01213, as modified by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on October 3, 2023, case No. 23–30445, is stayed. The application for stay is also treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted on the questions presented in the application (case No. 23-411). The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from grant of application for stay. (Detached Opinion)
Oct 20 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 26 2023Motion for leave to intervene filed by Kennedy Plaintiffs.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 01 2023Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 02 2023Response in opposition to motion to intervene from petitioners Vivek H. Murthy, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Response in opposition to motion to intervene from respondents Missouri, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Reply on motion to intervene filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 01 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 19, 2023. The time to file respondent's briefs on the merits is extended to and including February 2, 2024.
Dec 11 2023Motion of Kennedy Plaintiffs for leave to intervene DENIED. Justice Alito, dissenting from the denial of the motion to intervene. (Detached Opinion)
Dec 19 2023Brief of petitioners Vivek H. Murthy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amici curiae of NetChoice, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute, in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of The International Municipal Lawyers Association in support of neither party (also as to 22-842) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of The Lawyer's Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amici curiae of Secretaries of State of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Coalition for Independent Technology Research filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amicus curiae of Stanford University filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States Senator Mark Warner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amicus curiae of Election Officials in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 18, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Feb 02 2024Brief of respondents Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Louder with Crowder, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Center for American Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Justin Hart and the Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of The “Twitter Files” Journalists: Matt Taibbi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Kennedy Plaintiffs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Informed Consent Action Network filed. (Feb. 13, 2024)(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Free Enterprise Chamber of Commerce filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Religious Broadcasters filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Charlie Kirk, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of International Center For Law & Economics filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of America’s Frontline Doctors and Dr. Simone Gold, M.D., J.D. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Angela Reading filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Amicus Populi and Freedom X filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2024Brief amici curiae of Jim Jordan, et al. filed.(Feb. 15, 2024) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED
Feb 15 2024Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument out of time filed by respondents Jayanta Bhattacharya, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 29 2024Record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana and available with the Clerk.
Mar 04 2024Reply of petitioners Vivek H. Murthy, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2024Motion for leave to file out of time, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument DENIED.
Mar 18 2024Argued. For petitioners: Brian H. Fletcher, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: J. Benjamin Aguiñaga, Solicitor General, Baton Rouge, La.
Jun 26 2024Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Barrett, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Sotomayor, Kagan, Kavanaugh, and Jackson, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Gorsuch, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Vivek H. Murthy , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathon Christian Burns
    Counsel of Record
Burns Law Firm
PO Box 191250
Saint Louis, MO 63119

john@burns-law-firm.com
13143295040
Party name: Jim Hoft
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

MURRILLE@AG.LOUISIANA.GOV
225-326-6766
Party name: Missouri, et al.
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2029186902
Party name: Jayanta Bhattacharya, Martin Kulldorff, Aaron Kheriaty, Ms. Jill Hines
Jorge Benjamin AguinagaSolicitor General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

225-326-6079
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Joshua Michael DivineOffice of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: Missouri, et al.
D. John SauerJames Otis Law Group, LLC
13321 North Outer Forty Road
Suite 300
St. Louis, MO 63017

John.Sauer@james-otis.com
314-562-0031
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Alexander Abraham Abdo
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amendment Inst. at Columbia Univ.
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

alex.abdo@knightcolumbia.org
6467458500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
John Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: Stanford University
Seth Daniel Berlin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1909 K Street, NW, 12th Floor
Washington, DC 20006-1157

berlins@ballardspahr.com
(202) 508-1122
Party name: The Coalition for Independent Technology Research
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Angela Reading
David Ryan Brody
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, N.W.
Ste 900
Washington, DC 20005

DBRODY@LAWYERSCOMMITTEE.ORG
202-662-8600
Party name: The Lawyer's Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, Common Cause, and Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights
Brennan Tyler BrooksThomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: Angela Reading
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bruce.brown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates
Michael Blandford Buschbacher
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street NW, Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mbuschbacher@boydengray.com
(202) 955-0620
Party name: American Free Enterprise Chamber of Commerce
D. Adam Candeub
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
1185 Wrightwind Drive
Okemos, MI 48864

candeub@msu.edu
517 918 7147
Party name: THE “TWITTER FILES” JOURNALISTS: MATT TAIBBI, MICHAEL SHELLENBERGER, LEE FANG, DAVID ZWEIG, LEIGHTON WOODHOUSE, ALEX GUTENTAG
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
(614) 224-4422
Party name: Buckeye Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

bob.corn-revere@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression, et al.
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
4201 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22203

CCRAWFORD@AFPHQ.ORG
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
David Anthony Dalia
    Counsel of Record
700 Camp Street
New Orleans, LA 70130

davidadalia@gmail.com
504-524-5541
Party name: America’s Frontline Doctors and Dr. Simone Gold, M.D., J.D.
Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
1311 South Main Street, Suite 207
Mount Airy, MD 21771

harmeet@dhillonlaw.com
7036876212
Party name: Center for American Liberty
M. E. Buck Dougherty III
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

BDOUGHERTY@LIBERTYJUSTICECENTER.ORG
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center and Justin Hart
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Michael P. Farris
    Counsel of Record
660 North Capitol Street NW
Suite 210
Washington, DC 20001

mfarris@nrb.org
202-341-4783
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

CATHY@CGCOUNSEL.COM
2026422849
Party name: Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute
David Morris Gossett
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street NW
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

davidgossett@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: NetChoice, the Computer & Communications Industry Association (CCIA), Chamber of Progress, and the Cato Institute
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

DAVIDG@EFF.ORG
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Center for Democracy & Technology
Jason Seth Harrow
    Counsel of Record
Gerstein Harrow LLP
12100 Wilshire Blvd
Ste 800
Los Angeles, CA 90025

jason@gerstein-harrow.com
3237445293
Party name: Secretaries of State of Arizona, Colorado, Connecticut, Maine, Minnesota, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont
Mary Holland
    Counsel of Record
Children's Health Defense
853 Franklin Ave, Suite 511
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417

MARY.HOLLAND@CHILDRENSHEALTHDEFENSE.ORG
2028541310
Party name: Kennedy Plaintiffs
Spencer Scot Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Tycko & Zavareei LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 1010
Washington, DC 20006

SHUGHES@TZLEGAL.COM
2029730900
Party name: United States Senator Mark Warner
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

SJOHNSON@WSGR.COM
(202) 973-8888
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Amicus Populi and Freedom X
Georgios Mavros
    Counsel of Record
Louder with Crowder, LLC
1201 N. Riverfront Blvd, Ste 150
Dallas, TX 75207-4017

GMavros@LouderWithCrowder.com
(817) 650-2240
Party name: Louder with Crowder, LLC
Charles Michael Miller
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Ste. 801
Washington, DC 20036

cmiller@ifs.org
2023019800
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Jim Jordan and 44 Other Members of Congress
Jessica Anne Morton
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

jmorton@democracyforward.org
202-843-1642
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American College of Physicians, and American Geriatrics Society
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
11921 Freedom Dr., Ste. 550
Reston, VA 20190

anichols@charislex.com
(571) 549-2645
Party name: International Center For Law & Economics
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Free Speech Coalition, Free Speech Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Tennessee Firearms Association, Public Advocate, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, Leadership Institute, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, The Western Journal, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: Charlie Kirk, David Harris, Jr., and Robby Starbuck
Matthew Adam Seligman
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

mseligman@stris.com
(213) 995-6873
Party name: Election Officials
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212-599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute, React19, and Three Vaccine-Injured Individuals
Aaron Siri
    Counsel of Record
Siri & Glimstad LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
Suite 500
New York, NY 10151

aaron@sirillp.com
212-532-1091
Party name: Informed Consent Action Network
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
109 Second St., NE
Washington, DC 20002

COURT@LC.ORG
(202) 289-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Montana
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: The International Municipal Lawyers Association
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543