Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-374
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-374
Title:Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bryan David Range
Docketed:October 10, 2023
Linked with 23A140
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2835)
   Decision Date:June 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2023Application (23A140) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 25 2023Application (23A140) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 5, 2023.
Oct 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2023)
Proof of ServicePetition
Oct 18 2023Brief of respondent Bryan David Range in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 01 2023Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Bryan David Range

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543