SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-365
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-365
Title:
Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Douglas J. Horn
Docketed:
October 5, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-349-cv)
Decision Date:
August 22, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 06 2023
Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 07 2023
Waiver of right of respondent Douglas Horn, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 14 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Nov 16 2023
Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2023)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024
LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Benjamin
Counsel of Record
The Linden Law Group, P.C.
250 Park Avenue, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10177
jbenjamin@nyfraudlaw.com
212-655-9536
Party name: Douglas Horn, et al.
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
Counsel of Record
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006
lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation & DRI Center for Law and Public Policy
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##