Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-315
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-315
Title:VirnetX Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd., et al.
Docketed:September 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2271, 2020-2272)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2023
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:June 22, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2023)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2023Waiver of right of respondent Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 02 2023Waiver of right of respondent Apple Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 02 2023Waiver of right of respondent Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 04 2023Waiver of right of respondent Black Swamp IP, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Oct 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2023Response Requested. (Due November 27, 2023)
Oct 31 2023Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2023 to December 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2023, for all respondents.
Nov 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Brief of respondents Katherine K. Vidal, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Brief of respondents Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd. et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 10 2024Reply of petitioners VirnetX Inc. and Leidos, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2024Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Naveen Modi
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

NAVEENMODI@PAULHASTINGS.COM
(202) 551-1700
Party name: VirnetX Inc. and Leidos, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
James T. Bailey
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of James T. Bailey
504 W. 136th St. #1B
New York, NY 10031

jtb@jtbaileylaw.com
9176261356
Party name: Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd.
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

MARK.FLEMING@WILMERHALE.COM
6175266000
Party name: Apple Inc.
Wesley C. Meinerding
    Counsel of Record
Martin & Ferraro, LLP
1557 Lake O'Pines Street NE
Hartsville, OH 44632

wmeinerding@martinferraro.com
330-877-0700
Party name: Black Swamp IP, LLC
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office
Other
Thomas Arthur Berry
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

tberry@cato.org
(202) 789-5202
Party name: Cato Institute
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9152
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation Organization

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543