Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-279
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-279
Title:Couy Griffin, Petitioner
v.
New Mexico, ex rel. Marco White, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Mexico
   Case Numbers:(S-1-SC-39571)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 16, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Waiver of right of respondents New Mexico, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Nov 14 2023Response Requested. (Due December 14, 2023)
Dec 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2023 to January 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2024.
Jan 16 2024Brief of respondents New Mexico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2024Reply of petitioner Couy Griffin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter David Ticktin
    Counsel of Record
The Ticktin Law Group, P.A.
270 SW Natura Ave
Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

serv512@legalbrains.com
954-570-6757
Party name: Couy Griffin
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

JMATZ@KAPLANHECKER.COM
(212) 763-0883
Party name: State of New Mexico, et al.
Stuart Craig McPhailCREW
1331 F Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20004

smcphail@citizensforethics.org
202-408-5565
Party name: State of New Mexico, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543