Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-253
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-253
Vide 23-250
Title:Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Northern Arapaho Tribe
Docketed:September 15, 2023
Linked with 23A156
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-8046)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:June 2, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2023Application (23A156) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 31, 2023 to September 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Application (23A156) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 20, 2023.
Sep 15 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 11 2023Brief of Northern Arapaho Tribe filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 20 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Oct 24 2023Reply of petitioners Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 20 2023Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 23-250 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Nov 20 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 23-250. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 23-250. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 25, 2024. VIDED.
Jan 30 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit.
Feb 01 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED
Mar 25 2024Argued. For petitioners: Caroline A. Flynn, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent in 23-253: Adam G. Unikowsky, Washington, D. C. For respondent in 23-250: Lloyd B. Miller, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Northern Arapaho Tribe
Other
Steven Douglas Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight
800 17th Street Northwest- Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20006

steven.gordon@hklaw.com
202-955-3000
Party name: National Congress of American Indians and Various Tribes and Tribal Organizations
Jennifer H. Weddle
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
1144 15th Street
Ste. 3300
Denver, CO 80202

weddlej@gtlaw.com
13035726565
Party name: Coalition of Large Tribes

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543