SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-248 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-248 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Garfield Broadnax, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
September 14, 2023
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-81,573-02)
Decision Date:
June 7, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 21 2023
Letter dated September 21, 2023, from counsel for petitioner with clarification of a factual statement filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 02 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2023 to November 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2023.
Oct 16 2023
Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 03 2023
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023
Reply of petitioner James Garfield Broadnax filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 04 2023
Record Requested.
Dec 05 2023
Electronic record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas.
Dec 13 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 02 2024
Rescheduled.
Feb 02 2024
Supplemental brief of petitioner James Garfield Broadnax filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Craig Herzog
Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019
sherzog@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3000
Party name: James Garfield Broadnax
Attorneys for Respondent
Michele O'Brien Yeatts
Counsel of Record
Dallas County District Attorney
133 North Riverfront Blvd., LB-19
Dallas, TX 75207-4399
SYEATTS@DALLASCOUNTY.ORG
214-653-3630
Party name: Texas
Other
Michaele N Turnage Young
Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW, 6th Floor
Washington, DC 20005
MTURNAGEYOUNG@NAACPLDF.ORG
(202) 216-5567
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##