Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-21
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-21
Title:Stuart R. Harrow, Petitioner
v.
Department of Defense
Docketed:July 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-2254)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:April 17, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 7, 2023 to September 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 6, 2023.
Aug 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2023 to October 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 6, 2023.
Oct 06 2023Brief of respondent Department of Defense in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2023Reply of petitioner Stuart R. Harrow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 07 2023Rescheduled.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 08 2023Petition GRANTED.
Dec 21 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Stuart R. Harrow.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Brief of petitioner Stuart R. Harrow filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 18 2024Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Government Employees filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 25, 2024.
Jan 30 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.
Feb 01 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit and available with the Clerk.
Feb 12 2024Brief of respondent Department of Defense filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott William Dodson
    Counsel of Record
UC Law, San Francisco
Professor of Law
200 McAlister Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

dodson@alumni.duke.edu
925-285-1445
Party name: Stuart R. Harrow
Mark David HarrisProskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mharris@proskauer.com
212-969-3530
Party name: Stuart R. Harrow
John Edward RobertsProskauer Rose LLP
One International Place
Boston, MA 02110

jroberts@proskauer.com
617.526.9813
Party name: Stuart R. Harrow
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Defense
Other
Stanley Edward Blackmon
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1819 Fifth Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203

sblackmon@bradley.com
2055218002
Party name: Law Professors
Benjamin Conrad Block
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

bblock@cov.com
(202) 662-5205
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program
William Henry Burgess IV
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20004

wburgess@kirkland.com
202-389-5000
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Andres Myles Grajales
    Counsel of Record
AFGE, Office of the General Counsel
80 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

grajaa@afge.org
2026396426
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
NTEU
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

JULIE.WILSON@NTEU.ORG
703-352-3325
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543