Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-167 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-167 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Joseph Clifton Smith
Docketed:August 21, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-14519)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Idaho, et. al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief of respondent Joseph Clifton Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Joseph Clifton Smith.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 04 2023Reply of petitioner Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Rescheduled.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 01 2023Rescheduled.
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 08 2023Rescheduled.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 16 2023Rescheduled.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 15 2023Record Requested.
Jan 02 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 02 2024Electronic record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the 11th Circuit.
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 09 2024Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama (2 boxes).
Jan 16 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Feb 09 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 26 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections
Attorneys for Respondent
Kacey Keeton
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender, Middle District of Alabama
817 S. Court Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

kacey_keeton@fd.org
334-834-2099
Party name: Joseph Clifton Smith
Other
Joshua Nathaniel Turner
    Counsel of Record
ldaho Attorney General's Office
700 W Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720

josh.turner@ag.idaho.gov
2083323548
Party name: Idaho, et. al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543