Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-14
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-14
Title:Delilah Guadalupe Diaz, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 5, 2023
Linked with 22A954
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50238)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:March 3, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2023Application (22A954) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2023 to July 1, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
May 02 2023Application (22A954) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 1, 2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2023 to September 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 5, 2023. See Rule 30.1.
Aug 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2023 to September 28, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 28, 2023.
Sep 28 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Oct 18 2023Reply of petitioner Delilah Diaz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Dec 27 2023Motion to file petitioner's brief on the merits under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioner Delilah Diaz.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Redacted brief of petitioner Delilah Diaz filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Motion to file petitioner's brief on the merits under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Jan 26 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 19, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Jan 30 2024Sealed material received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and available with the Clerk. The remainder of the record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 01 2024Brief amici curiae of John Monahan, et. al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law - Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA , CT 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Delilah Diaz
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Matthew Albert Coles
    Counsel of Record
University of Calif College of the Law San Francis
200 McAllister Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

colesm@uclawsf.edu
415 565 4793
Party name: John Monahan, David Faigman, et. als.
Vincent J. Brunkow
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of San Diego, Inc.
225 Broadway, Ste. 900
San Diego, CA 92101

VINCE_BRUNKOW@FD.ORG
6192348467
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Carmen Gloria Iguina Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

ciguina@kaplanhecker.com
212-763-0883
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543