Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-138
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-138
Title:Jackie Williams Simpson, et al., Appellants
v.
John Thurston, Arkansas Secretary of State
Docketed:August 15, 2023
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
   Case Numbers:(4:22-cv-00213-JM-DRS-DPM)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2023Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 14, 2023)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2023Waiver of right of appellee John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 31 2023Response Requested. (Due October 2, 2023)
Sep 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2023 to November 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2023.
Sep 08 2023Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from appellant filed. (Received September 12, 2023)
Main Document
Nov 01 2023Motion to affirm filed by appellee John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Richard Hartley Mays
    Counsel of Record
Richard Mays Law Firm PLLC
2225 Cottondale Lane
Suite 210
Little Rock, AR 72202

rmays@richmayslaw.com
(501) 891-6116
Party name: Jackie Williams Simpson, et al.
Attorneys for Appellee
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV
501-682-6302
Party name: John Thurston, in His Official Capacity as the Arkansas Secretary of State

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543