Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1351
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1351
Title:Torrey Lynne Henderson, Amara Jana Ridge, and Justin Royce Thompson, Petitioners
v.
Texas
Docketed:June 27, 2024
Linked with 23A1169
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Seventh District
   Case Numbers:(07-22-00303-CR, 07-22-00304-CR, 07-22-00305-CR)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 27, 2024

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2024Application (23A1169) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 02 2024Response to application (23A1169) requested by Justice Alito, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on Tuesday, July 9, 2024.
Jul 09 2024Response to application from respondent Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 12 2024Reply of applicant Torrey Lynne Henderson, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jul 16 2024Application (23A1169) referred to the Court.
Jul 16 2024Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2024Application (23A1169) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Savannah Kumar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Texas
1018 Preston St. Floor 4
Houston, TX 77002

skumar@aclutx.org
617-539-6620
Party name: Torrey Lynne Henderson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543