Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1280
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1280
Title:Parents Protecting Our Children, UA, Petitioner
v.
Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, et al.
Docketed:June 7, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1534)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors S. Ernie Walton and Eric A. DeGroff filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2024Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute and Dr. Leor Sapir filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center and Dr. Erica Anderson filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Elizabeth Mirabelli and Lori West filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of NC Values Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amicus curiae of Parents Defending Education filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2024Brief of respondents Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Luke Nathaniel Berg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.
330 East Kilbourn Avenue
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

luke@will-law.org
6084696891
Party name: Parents Protecting Our Children, UA
Attorneys for Respondents
Ronald S. Stadler
    Counsel of Record
Stadler Sacks LLC
303 N. Main Street
West Bend, WI 53095

rss@stadlersacks.com
8475499611
Party name: Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Michael Trissell
    Counsel of Record
LiMandri & Jonna LLP; Thomas More Society
P.O. Box 9120
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

JTRISSELL@LIMANDRI.COM
8587599930
Party name: Elizabeth Mirabelli and Lori West
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
655 Fifteenth St., NW, Ste. 425
Washington, DC 20005

rick@claybrooklaw.com
301-622-0360
Party name: Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

MIKE@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
7032439423
Party name: Parents Defending Education
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

LAWYERDEBORAH@OUTLOOK.COM
9103264554
Party name: NC Values Institute
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
P.O. Box 148
Gallant, AL 35972

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Christopher Theodore Holinger
    Counsel of Record
Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
1000 Regent Univ. Drive
Suite 303
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

chriho3@regent.edu
757 697-6488
Party name: Professors S. Ernie Walton and Eric A. DeGroff
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
13341 W. U.S. Highway 290
Building 2
Austin, TX 78737

JHUEBERT@ljc.org
5124814400
Party name: Liberty Justice Center and Dr. Erica Anderson
Erika Lauren Maley
    Counsel of Record
Virginia Office of the Attorney General
202 North 9th Street
Richmond, VA 23219

emaley@oag.state.va.us
804-786-2071
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Public Advocate of the United States, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, LONANG Institute, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute and Dr. Leor Sapir
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543