Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-124
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-124
Title:William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2, Petitioner
v.
Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Docketed:August 10, 2023
Linked with 23A87
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-110, 22-113, 22-115, 22-116, 22-117, 22-119, 22-121, 22-299, 22-203)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2023Application (23A87) for a stay, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 28 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (See order of August 10, 2023)
Jul 28 2023Response to application (23A87) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due by noon (EDT), Friday, August 4, 2023.
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent State of California filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent Ad Hoc Group of Individual Victims of Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent Debtors, Purdue Pharma L.P., and Its Affiliates filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent Multi-State Governmental Entities Group filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent City of Grande Prairie, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Response to application from respondent The Ad Hoc Committee of Governmental and Other Contingent Litigation Claimants filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 07 2023Reply of applicant William K. Harrington filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Aug 08 2023Sur-Reply to Application of Debtors, Purdue Pharma L.P., and Its Affiliates not accepted for filing. (August 08, 2023)
Aug 09 2023Motion to Direct the Clerk to File a Sur-Reply filed by respondent Debtors, Purdue Pharma L.P., and Its Affiliates.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 09 2023Motion to Direct the Clerk to File a Sur-Reply denied by Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 10 2023Application (23A87) referred to the Court.
Aug 10 2023Petition GRANTED.
Aug 10 2023Application (23A87) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted. The mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in case No. 22-110 and the consolidated cases is recalled and stayed. Applicant suggested this Court treat the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari; doing so, the petition is granted. The parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether the Bankruptcy Code authorizes a court to approve, as part of a plan of reorganization under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code, a release that extinguishes claims held by nondebtors against nondebtor third parties, without the claimants’ consent. The Clerk is directed to establish a briefing schedule that will allow the case to be argued in the December 2023 argument session. The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.
Aug 21 2023The following briefing schedule is established: The joint appendix, petitioner's brief on the merits, and the brief of any respondent in support, is to be filed on or before Wednesday, September 20, 2023. Respondents' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Friday, October 20, 2023. Any reply brief is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3.
Sep 14 2023Letter of respondents California, Connecticut and Oregon notifying the Clerk that they will not be filing or joining a brief on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief of petitioner William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2 filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 20 2023Joint appendix (Volume 1) filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 20 2023Joint appendix (Volume 2) filed.
Main Document
Sep 20 2023Brief of respondent Ellen Isaacs, on behalf of Patrick Ryan Wroblewski filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief of respondents City of Grande Prairie, as representative plaintiff for a class consisting of all Canadian municipalities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Brief amici curiae of The Honorable Eugene Wedoff (Ret.) and Law Professors Sara Green, George Kuney, Stephen Lubben, and Lawrence Ponoroff filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2023Amicus brief of Martin J. Bienenstock And Daniel S. Desatnik submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of NexPoint Advisors, L.P. and NexPoint Asset Management, L.P. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of American College of Bankruptcy submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Insolvency Law Committee of Business Law Section of California Lawyers Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Adam J. Levitin submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Bankruptcy Law Professors submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of The Commercial Law League of America and The National Bankruptcy Venue Reform Committee submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Kim Harold Peterson submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Atlantic Basin Refining, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of "Texas Two-Step" Victims submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2023Amicus brief of Bankruptcy Law Professors Ralph Brubaker, Bruce A. Markell, and Jonathan M. Seymour submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 2
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: City of Grande Prairie, as representative plaintiff for a class consisting of all Canadian municipalities, et al.
Ze-wen Julius Chen
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

chenj@akingump.com
202-887-4475
Party name: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Brian Thomas Edmunds
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

bedmunds@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6578
Party name: Maryland
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

RENGLERT@KRAMERLEVIN.COM
2027754503
Party name: The Ad Hoc Committee of Governmental and Other Contingent Litigation Claimants
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: Debtors, Purdue Pharma L.P., and Its Affiliates
Kevin C. Maclay
    Counsel of Record
Caplin and Drysdale, Chartered
One Thomas Circle, NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20005

KMACLAY@CAPDALE.COM
202-862-7841
Party name: Multi-State Governmental Entities Group
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

JOSH.PATASHNIK@DOJ.CA.GOV
619-738-9628
Party name: California
Michael Sague Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Eisenberg & Baum LLP
24 Union Square East PH
New York, NY 10003

mquinn@eandblaw.com
212-353-8700
Party name: Ellen Isaacs, on behalf of Patrick Ryan Wroblewski
John Christopher Shore
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

cshore@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8394
Party name: Ad Hoc Group of Individual Victims of Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al.
Jeffrey Allen LiesemerCaplin & Drysdale, Chartered
One Thomas Circle, N.W., Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20005

jliesemer@capdale.com
2028625007
Party name: Multi-State Governmental Entities Group
Other
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

MBIENENSTOCK@PROSKAUER.COM
(212) 969-3000
Party name: Martin J. Bienenstock And Daniel S. Desatnik
Andrew Kenton Glenn
    Counsel of Record
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10036

aglenn@glennagre.com
(212) 970-1600
Party name: Bankruptcy Law Professors Ralph Brubaker, Bruce A. Markell, and Jonathan M. Seymour
Leonard L. Gumport
    Counsel of Record
Gumport Law Firm, PC
225 S. Lake Ave
Suite 300
Passadena, CA 91101

lgumport@gumportlaw.net
626-432-7283
Party name: Insolvency Law Committee of Business Law Section of California Lawyers Association
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

DEEPAK@GUPTAWESSLER.COM
(202) 888-1741
Party name: "Texas Two-Step" Victims
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

DAVIDKUNEY@DKUNEY.COM
(301) 299-4336
Party name: The Honorable Eugene Wedoff (Ret.) and Law Professors Sara Green, George Kuney, Stephen Lubben, and Lawrence Ponoroff
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

JLAMKEN@MOLOLAMKEN.COM
2025562010
Party name: NexPoint Advisors, L.P. and NexPoint Asset Management, L.P.
Jonathan Charles Lipson
    Counsel of Record
Temple University--Beasley School of Law
1719 North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19122

jlipson@temple.edu
(215) 204-0608
Party name: Bankruptcy Law Professors
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

RLOEB@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8475
Party name: American College of Bankruptcy
Douglas Barrett Rosner
    Counsel of Record
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
400 Atlantic Avenue
Boston, MA 02110

drosner@goulstonstorrs.com
617-5746517
Party name: The Commercial Law League of America and The National Bankruptcy Venue Reform Committee
Andrew C. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Andrew C Simpson, PC
2191 Church street
Ste 5
Christiansted, VI 00820

asimpson@coralbrief.com
3407193900
Party name: Atlantic Basin Refining, Inc.
Rupa Gupta Singh
    Counsel of Record
Niddrie Addams Fuller Singh LLP
501 West Broadway, Suite 800
San Diego, CA 92101

rsingh@appealfirm.com
858.699.7278
Party name: Kim Harold Peterson
Daniel R. Walfish
    Counsel of Record
Katsky Korins LLP
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158

dwalfish@katskykorins.com
212-716-3293
Party name: Adam J. Levitin

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543