Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1148
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1148
Title:G-Max Management, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:April 23, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2448)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2024 to June 24, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 24, 2024, for all respondents.
May 10 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Small Property Owners - NY, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Realtors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2024Brief of respondents New York, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2024Brief of respondents N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors and Community Voices Heard in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 09 2024Reply of petitioners G-Max Management, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Randy Michael Mastro
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas
34th Floor
New York, NY 10036

rmastro@kslaw.com
(212) 556-1200
Party name: G-Max Management, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Corey Lynn Stoughton
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

cstoughton@selendygay.com
2123909000
Party name: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors and Community Voices Heard
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, Letitia James, RuthAnne Visnauskas, and Woody Pascal
Other
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067

MMBERGER@MANATT.COM
(310) 312-4185
Party name: The Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute
Thomas Arthur Berry
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

tberry@cato.org
(202) 789-5202
Party name: Cato Institute
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464190
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Gerald Brinton Lucas
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

blucas@jonesday.com
202-879-3686
Party name: National Association of Realtors
E. Christopher Murray
    Counsel of Record
Rivkin Radler LLP
926 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

e.murray@rivkin.com
516-357-3000
Party name: Small Property Owners - NY, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543