Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1122
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1122
Title:Free Speech Coalition, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas
Docketed:April 16, 2024
Linked with 23A925
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-50627)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2024Application (23A925) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 17 2024Response to application (23A925) requested by Justice Alito, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on April 26, 2024.
Apr 26 2024Response to application from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 29 2024Reply of applicant Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Apr 30 2024Application (23A925) referred to the Court.
Apr 30 2024Application (23A925) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied.
May 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2024 to June 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 07 2024Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2024.
May 16 2024Brief amici curiae of American Booksellers for Free Expression, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2024Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Woodhull Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 30 2024Brief of respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 04 2024Reply of petitioners Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

DEREKSHAFFER@QUINNEMANUEL.COM
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas
Other
Amer Shahid Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

aahmed@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-2427
Party name: International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children
Kenneth A. Bamberger
    Counsel of Record
Boalt Hall Schol of LawUniversity of CA
University of CA-7200
Bulid. 7200
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

kbamberger@berkeley.edu
5106436218
Party name: American Booksellers for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Authors Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, and Freedom to Read Foundation
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

bob.corn-revere@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Aaron David Mackey
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

AMACKEY@EFF.ORG
415 436 9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Woodhull Freedom Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543