Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-1103
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-1103
Title:Sawtooth Mountain Ranch, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States Forest Service, et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-35324)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2024Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondents to respond filed.
Main Document
May 13 2024Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich & Cunningham filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Sawtooth Conservation & Recreation Alliance, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2024Supplemental brief of petitioners Sawtooth Mountain Ranch, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed.)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
Jun 10 2024Petition DENIED.
Jul 05 2024Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067

MMBERGER@MANATT.COM
(310) 312-4185
Party name: Sawtooth Mountain Ranch, LLC, Lynn Arnone, and David Boren
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Other
Albert P. Barker
    Counsel of Record
Marten Law LLP
101 S. Capitol Boulevard
Ste. 1200
Boise, ID 83702-0000

abarker@martenlaw.com
208.336.0700
Party name: Sawtooth Conservation & Recreation Alliance, Inc.
David Christopher McDonald
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd.
Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22201

dmcdonald@pacificlegal.org
2028886881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation; NFIB Legal Center; Owners' Counsel of America
Kristen Ditlevsen Renfro
    Counsel of Record
Desmond, Nolan, Livaich & Cunningham
1830 15th Street
Suite 200
Sacramento, CA 95811

krenfro@dnlc.net
916.443.2051
Party name: Desmond, Nolan, Livaich & Cunningham

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543