Docket for 23-1007
|
Mar 11 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2024) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Cornell Univ., et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | | Apr 18 2024 | Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2024) | | |
|