Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22O153
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22O153
Title:Texas, Plaintiff
v.
California
Docketed:February 11, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2020Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted, and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2020.
Apr 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of West Virginia, Kansas, Tennessee, and 16 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2020Brief of defendant California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2020Reply of plaintiff Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Dec 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 23 2020Supplemental brief of defendant California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 24 2020Supplemental brief of plaintiff Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint DENIED. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, dissenting from denial of motion for leave to file complaint. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: California
Other
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: West Virginia, Kansas, Tennessee, and 16 Other States
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543