Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22O151
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22O151
Title:Arizona, Plaintiff
v.
Richard Sackler, et al.
Docketed:August 6, 2019
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2019Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted, and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2019, for all defendants.
Sep 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of States of Ohio, Alaska, Louisiana, North Dakota, and Utah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019Brief of defendants Purdue Pharma, L.P., and Purdue Pharma Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Letter of October 30, 2019, from counsel for defendants Richard S. Sackler, et al. and counsel for defendants Mortimer D.A. Sackler et al. received.
Main Document
Nov 18 2019Reply of plaintiff State of Arizona filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: State of Arizona
Attorneys for Respondents
David A. ZwallyHaug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

dzwally@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Purdue Holdings L.P., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., BR Holdings Associates L.P.
Benjamin Shalom Kaminetzky
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

ben.kaminetzky@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc.
John Caleb Dougherty
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

jdougherty@haugpartners.com
6174266800
Party name: Purdue Holdings L.P., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., BR Holdings Associates L.P.
Gregory P. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC
485 Lexington Avenue, 30th Floor
New York, NY 10017

gjoseph@jha.com
2124071200
Party name: David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Rosebay Medical Company, L.P.
Maura Kathleen Monaghan
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

mkmonaghan@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, The Beacon Company
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alaska, Louisiana, North Dakota, and Utah

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543