Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22O146
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22O146
Title:Arkansas, et al., Plaintiffs
v.
Delaware
Docketed:June 13, 2016
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2016Documents filed with the Special Master may be found on the Special Master's website at http://ww2.ca2.uscourts.gov/specialmaster/special_145.html
Jun 09 2016Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Jul 15 2016Brief amicus curiae of MoneyGram Payment Systems, Inc. filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief in Response to motion for leave to file a bill of complaint, and Motion for leave to file Counterclaim filed by Delaware.
Aug 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 19 2016Letter received from Plaintiff
Oct 03 2016The Motion to file a Bill of Complaint and the Motion for leave to file a Counterclaim are granted. This case is consolidated with Original 145 and the parties are allowed thirty days in which to file answers to the Complaints and the Counterclaims.
Oct 10 2016Motion for leave to amend Bill of Complaint filed by Arkansas, et al., Plaintiffs.
Oct 28 2016Pennsylvania's Answer and Counterclaims to Delaware's Bill of Complaint filed.
Nov 01 2016Answer to Counterclaim filed by Arkansas, et al, Plaintiffs
Nov 01 2016Answer to Arkansas, et al.'s Bill of Complaint filed by Delaware.
Nov 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 11 2016Motion for leave to file bill of third party complaint filed by defendant Pennsylvania Plaintiff.
Nov 28 2016Motion of Arkansas, et al., for leave to amend Bill of Complaint GRANTED.
Dec 06 2016It has been suggested that the parties are in agreement on the facts relevant to a decision in this action. If this is the case, the parties are invited to file a stipulation of facts in this Court on or before 60 days from the date of this order. If such a stipulation is filed, the Court will set a schedule for briefing the legal issues. If such a stipulation is not timely filed, a Special Master will be appointed to conduct any necessary discovery and to make proposed findings of fact, and the case will proceed in the usual manner.
Dec 28 2016Brief of MoneyGram Payment Systems, Inc. in opposition to Motion for Leave to File Bill of Third Party Complaint filed.VIDED.
Jan 09 2017Motion for leave to amend counterclaim filed by defendant Delaware.
Jan 11 2017Reply of respondent Pennsylvania in further support of motion for leave to file Bill of Third Party Complaint filed. VIDED.
Jan 18 2017Response to Delaware's Motion for Leave to Amend Bill of Complaint from Pennsylvania filed.
Jan 24 2017Response in opposition to Delaware's motion for leave to amend bill of complaint from Wisconsin filed.
Jan 26 2017Response in opposition to Delaware's motion for leave to amend counterclaim from Arkansas, et al., filed.
Feb 01 2017Letter from the Parties in Response to Court's order of December 6, 2016.
Feb 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 29 2017It is ordered that the Honorable Pierre N. Leval, of New York, New York, is appointed Special Master in this case with authority to fix the time and conditions for the filing of additional pleadings, to direct subsequent proceedings, to summon witnesses, to issue subpoenas, and to take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit Reports as he may deem appropriate. The cost of printing his Reports, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses, shall be submitted to the Court.
Mar 31 2017Oath of Special Master filed
Jul 27 2021Because the Court has consolidated this case with No. 145, Original, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 145, Original. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 145. Each document submitted in connection with one or both of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in only one of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022..
Feb 22 2022The Exceptions to the Special Master Report are set for oral argument in due course. VIDED.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, October, 3, 2022. VIDED.
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Oct 03 2022Argued. For Delaware: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C. For Arkansas, et al.: Nicholas J. Bronni, Solicitor General, Little Rock, Ark. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Matthew Herman Haverstick
    Counsel of Record
One Liberty Place, 46th floor
1650 Market St.
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mhaverstick@kleinbard.com
215-496-7225
Party name: Pennsylvania Plaintiff
Nicholas J. Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
Office of the Arkansas
Attorney General
323 Center Street
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
(501) 682-6302
Party name: Arkansas, et al., Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven S. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
3rd Floor East
Washington, DC 20001

srosenthal@loeb.com
(202) 618-5000
Party name: Delaware
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Wisconsin
17 West Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin
Other
Michael Rato1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue P.O. Box 2075
Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

mrato@mdmc-law.com
(973)-993-8100
Party name: MoneyGram Payment Systems, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543