Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22A591
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22A591
Title:Nadine Gazzola, et al., Applicants
v.
Kathleen Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3068)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2022Application (22A591) for writ of injunction, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Response to application (22A591) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due by 4 p.m. (EST), on Wednesday, January 11, 2023.
Jan 11 2023Response to application from respondent Kathleen Hochul, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 12 2023Reply of applicant Nadine Gazzola, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Application (22A591) referred to the Court.
Jan 18 2023Application (22A591) for writ of injunction presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is denied.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paloma Appolonia Capanna
    Counsel of Record
Paloma A. Capanna
106-B Professional Park Drive
Beaufort, NC 28516

pcapanna@yahoo.com
(315) 584-2929
Party name: Nadine Gazzola, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Kathleen Hochul, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543