Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22A200
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22A200
Title:James Fetzer, Applicant
v.
Leonard Pozner
Docketed:September 2, 2022
Linked with 21-7916
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District IV
   Case Numbers:(2020AP121, 2020AP1570)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2022Application (22A200) for a stay, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Lower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 06 2022Application (22A200) denied by Justice Barrett.
Sep 08 2022Application (22A200) refiled and submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 21 2022Application (22A200) referred to the Court.
Oct 11 2022Application (22A200) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James H. Fetzer800 Violet Lane
Oregon, WI 53575

608-835-2707
Party name: James Fetzer

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543