Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22A178
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22A178
Title:Anthony Marciano, Applicant
v.
Eric Adams, Mayor of the City of New York, et al.
Docketed:August 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-570)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2022Application (22A178) Emergency Application for Writ of Injunction, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Application (22A178) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 01 2022Application (22A178) refiled and submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestWritten RequestWritten Request
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 14 2022Application (22A178) referred to the Court.
Sep 26 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief and brief filed by Physicians for Informed Consent.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 29 2022Motion for leave to file and brief of amicus curiae filed by Detectives’ Endowment Association, Inc.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Motion for leave to file and brief for amicus curiae filed by LBA, CEA and UFOA.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Motion for Leave to File and Brief of Amicus Curiae of Uniformed Firefighters Association submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 11 2022Application (22A178) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patricia Finn
    Counsel of Record
Patricia Finn Attorney. P.C.
58 East Route 59, Suite 4
Nanuet, NY 10954

patriciafinnattorney@gmail.com
845 398 0521
Party name: Anthony Marciano
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: Eric Adams, et al.
Other
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
(925) 642-6651
Party name: Physicians for Informed Consent
John William Burns
    Counsel of Record
Karasyk & Moschella, llP
233 Broadway, Suite 2340
New York, NY 10279

jburns@kmattorneys.com
(212) 233-3800
Party name: Detectives’ Endowment Association, Inc.
Harry Greenberg
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Burzichelli Greenberg P.C.
3000 Marcus Avenue
Suite 1W7
Lake Success, NY 11042-0000

hgreenberg@gbglawoffice.com
516-570-4343
Party name: LBA, CEA and UFOA
Robert G. Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan Papain Block McGrath Coffinas & Cannavo
120 Broadway, 27th Fl
New York, NY 10271

rsullivan@triallaw1.com
5167420707
Party name: Uniformed Firefighters Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543