Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-97
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-97
Vide 22-100, 22-98, 22-99
Title:Owl Creek Asia I, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2022
Linked with 21A711
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1934, 2020-1936, 2020-1938, 2020-1954, 2020-1955)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Application (21A711) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 12 2022Application (21A711) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 22, 2022.
Jul 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2022 to October 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 3, 2022.
Sep 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Owl Creek Asia I, L.P., Owl Creek Asia II, L.P., Owl Creek I, L.P., Owl Creek II, L.P., Owl Creek Asia Master Fund, Ltd., Owl Creek Credit Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Owl Creek Overseas Master Fund, Ltd., Owl Creek SRI Master Fund, Ltd., Mason Capital L.P., Mason Capital Master Fund L.P., Akanthos Opportunity Fund, L.P., Appaloosa Investment Limited Partnership I, Palomino Master Ltd., Azteca Partners LLC, Palomino Fund Ltd., CSS, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543