Docket for 22-957
|
Mar 29 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2023) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Chapter of the National Academy of Elder Law Attorneys filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 01 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services to respond filed. | | Main Document | May 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | | May 11 2023 | Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2023) | | | May 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2023 to July 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 18 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2023. | | | Jul 12 2023 | Brief of respondent Massachusetts Executive Office of Health and Human Services in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 26 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Jul 26 2023 | Reply of petitioners Laurie A. Dermody, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 02 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | |
|