Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-95
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-95
Title:Schuyler File, Petitioner
v.
Margaret Hickey, et al.
Docketed:August 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2387)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2022Waiver of right of respondents Chief Justice Annette Ziegler, Justices Patience Roggensack, Ann Walsh Bradley, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 24 2022Motion of Kathleen Brost and Larry Martin to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2022.
Aug 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed. (Sept. 2, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Amicus brief of Mackinac Center for Public Policy not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)(September 02, 2022)
Aug 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2022Brief of respondents Margaret Hickey and Larry Martin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Letter of notice of substitution of respondents Margaret Hickey and Larry Martin received.
Main Document
Oct 13 2022Reply of petitioner Schuyler File filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Oct 28 2022Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2022)
Nov 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 28, 2022.
Nov 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells St.
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Schuyler File
Attorneys for Respondents
Roberta Florence Howell
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
150 E. Gilman Street
Madison, WI 53703

rhowell@foley.com
608-257-5035
Party name: Margaret Hickey and Larry Martin
Clayton Patrick Kawski
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 West Main Street, P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53704-7857

kawskicp@doj.state.wi.us
608-266-9628
Party name: Chief Justice Annette Ziegler, Justices Patience Roggensack, Ann Walsh Bradley, et al.
Other
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

dcortman@adflegal.org
202-347-3622
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn Avenue
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.
Scott Day Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

sfreeman@goldwaterinstitute.org
602-462-5000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Sarah Elizabeth Roy Harbison
    Counsel of Record
Pelican Instititue for Public Policy
400 Poydras St., Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70130

sarah@pelicaninstitute.org
5049528016
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Derk Arend Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center Legal Foundation
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wilcox@mackinac.org
9896310900
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543