Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-9
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-9
Title:Whirlpool Financial Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:July 5, 2022
Linked with 21A713
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1899, 20-1900)
   Decision Date:December 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2022Application (21A713) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 31, 2022 to June 30, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 13 2022Application (21A713) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 30, 2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2022Brief amici curiae of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 18 2022Response Requested. (Due September 19, 2022)
Sep 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 19, 2022 to October 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 19, 2022.
Oct 19 2022Brief of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 02 2022Reply of petitioners Whirlpool Financial Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Whirlpool Financial Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
David William Foster
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

david.foster@skadden.com
202-371-7626
Party name: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deloitte Tax LLP, & KPMG LLP
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
202-373-6283
Party name: Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group, et al.
Lowell Dean Yoder
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
444 West Lake Street, Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60606-0029

lyoder@mwe.com
6308908876
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543