Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-899
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-899
Title:Jason Smith, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:March 16, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One
   Case Numbers:(1 CA-CR 21-0451)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 6, 2023
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2023Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
Apr 25 2023Response Requested. (Due May 25, 2023)
May 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2023 to June 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 26, 2023.
Jun 26 2023Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2023Reply of petitioner Jason Smith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioner Jason Smith filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 10, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of National College for DUI Defense, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Alameda County Public Defender, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Network, Forensic Justice Project, et al.. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Richard D. Friedman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One.
Nov 28 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 07 2023Record received from the Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One (one envelope). The remainder of the record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Dec 11 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondent Arizona filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Respondent's request to lodge non-record material pursuant to Rule 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of American Board of Forensic Toxicology, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National District Attorneys Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Colorado, et al. filed. (Distributed). (Corrected paper form of brief received and distributed--December 28, 2023--original electronic submission contains correction.)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2023Reply of petitioner Jason Smith filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2024Argued. For petitioner: Hari Santhanam, Chicago, Ill. For United States, as amicus curiae: Eric J. Feigin, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Alexander W. Samuels, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Phoenix, Ariz.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hari Santhanam
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
110 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

HSANTHANAM@PERKINSCOIE.COM
3123248447
Party name: Jason Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexander Westbrook Samuels
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ALEXANDER.SAMUELS@AZAG.GOV
602-542-4686
Party name: Arizona
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Kendra Nychel Beckwith
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
1601 19th Street
Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

kbeckwith@lewisroca.com
303-623-9000
Party name: American Board of Forensic Toxicology, et al.
Michelle Lynn Behan
    Counsel of Record
The Behan Law Group, PLLC
945 N. Stone Ave.
Tucson, AZ 85705

michelle.behan@missduiarizona.com
5202205047
Party name: National College for DUI Defense, Inc.
Richard D. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
625 South State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109-1215

rdfrdman@umich.edu
(734) 647-1078
Party name: Richard D. Friedman
Garry Michael Gaskins II
    Counsel of Record
Office of Oklahoma Attorney General
313 N.E. Twenty-First Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

GARRY.GASKINS@OAG.OK.GOV
405-312-2451
Party name: Oklahoma, Colorado, 36 Additional States, 1 Territory, and 1 Federal District
Albert Calvin Locher
    Counsel of Record
National District Attorneys Association
1400 Crystal Drive, Suite 330
Arlington, VA 22202

lochera@sacda.org
703-549-9222
Party name: National District Attorneys Association et al
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
202-626-5552
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, American Civil Liberties Union, and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Arizona
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Anna K. Sortun
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

anna.sortun@tonkon.com
503-802-2107
Party name: THE INNOCENCE NETWORK, FORENSIC JUSTICE PROJECT, AND THE CENTER FOR INTEGRITY IN FORENSIC SCIENCES, INC.
Joshi Ashoma Valentine
    Counsel of Record
Alameda County Public Defenders
1401 Lakeside Drive, Suite 400
Oakland, CA 94612

joshi.valentine@acgov.org
(510) 268-7486
Party name: Alameda County Public Defender and California Public Defenders Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543