SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-893
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-893
Title:
Libertarian Party of New York, et al., Petitioners
v.
New York State Board of Elections, et al.
Docketed:
March 16, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-44)
Decision Date:
October 19, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
December 12, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Oliver Barrett Hall
Counsel of Record
Center for Competitive Democracy
1835 16th Street NW
#5
Washington, DC 20009
OLIVERHALL@COMPETITIVEDEMOCRACY.ORG
202-248-9294
Party name: Libertarian Party of New York, Green Party of New York, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian David Ginsberg
Counsel of Record
Harris Beach PLLC
445 Hamilton Avenue
Suite 1206
White Plains, NY 10601
BGINSBERG@HARRISBEACH.COM
9146831200
Party name: New York Board of Elections, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##