Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-884
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-884
Vide 22-674
Title:Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Varinder Singh
Docketed:March 14, 2023
Linked with 22A584
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-70050)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2022
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2022Application (22A583) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2023 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Dec 29 2022Application (22A584) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2023 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Dec 29 2022Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 30 2022Application (22A583) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 9, 2023.
Dec 30 2022Application (22A584) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 9, 2023.
Jan 27 2023Application (22A583) to extend further the time from February 9, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 27 2023Application (22A584) to extend further the time from February 9, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 27 2023Application (22A583) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2023.
Jan 27 2023Application (22A584) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2023.
Mar 10 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2023)
Mar 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1.
Mar 28 2023Motion of respondent Raul D. Mendiz-Colin to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023, for all respondents.
Apr 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 15, 2023 to May 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2023, for all respondents.
May 22 2023Brief of respondents Varinder Singh and Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin in opposition filed.
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-674 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jun 30 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-674. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-674. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jun 30 2023As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Aug 04 2023The briefing proposal set forth in the Solicitor General’s letter of July 27, 2023, is adopted. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated opening brief on the merits, limited to 17,000 words, on or before August 29, 2023. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support, or in support of neither party, shall bear a light green cover. Petitioner in No. 22-674 and respondents in No. 22-884 may each file a response brief on the merits on or before October 18, 2023, and the briefs shall bear light red covers. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support shall bear a dark green cover. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated reply brief limited to 9,000 words. VIDED
Nov 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 8, 2024. VIDED.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 01 2023Sealed material from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit electronically available with the Clerk. The remainder of the record is available on PACER.
Jan 08 2024Argued. For Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General: Charles L. McCloud, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For petitioner in 22-674 and respondents in 22-884: Easha Anand, Stanford, Cal. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Att'y Gen.
Attorneys for Respondent
Saad Ahmad
    Counsel of Record
Saad Ahmad and Associates
39111 Paseo Padre Pkwy
Suite 217
Fremont, CA 94538

saadahmadlawfirm@gmail.com
510-713-9847
Party name: Varinder Singh
Christopher John Stender
    Counsel of Record
Federal Immigration Counselors, AZ
141 E. Palm Lane
Suite 112
Phoenix, AZ 85004

cjs@ficpcaz.com
(602) 254-5353
Party name: Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin
Easha AnandStanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

EANAND@STANFORD.EDU
(650) 724-3345
Party name: Varinder Singh
Raul Armando RayThe Law Offices of Raul Ray
1671 The Alameda, Suite 307
San Jose, CA 95126

RAULRAY@DEPORTATIONATTORNEY.COM
408-279-5793
Party name: Varinder Singh
Christopher John StenderFederal Immigration Counselors, AZ
141 E. Palm Lane Suite 112
Phoenix, AZ 85004

cjs@ficpcaz.com
6022545353
Party name: Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543