Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-868
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-868
Title:Ariel Marcelo Bastias, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:March 10, 2023
Linked with 22A655
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-11416)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:November 7, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2023Application (22A655) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2023 to March 8, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jan 23 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 23 2023Application (22A655) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 8, 2023.
Mar 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023)
Mar 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023.
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to May 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
May 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 23, 2023.
May 23 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Ariel Marcelo Bastias filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David J. Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Proctor LLP
100 Northern Ave.
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
(617) 570-1000
Party name: Ariel Marcelo Bastias
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543