Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-863
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-863
Title:Rafael Diaz-Rodriguez, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:March 10, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-73719)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023)
Mar 08 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Mar 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023.
Apr 10 2023Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2023Brief amici curiae of National Coalition for Child Protection Reform, et al. filed.
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to May 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
May 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 23, 2023.
May 23 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Rafael Diaz-Rodriguez filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David J. Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
(617) 570-1000
Party name: Rafael Diaz-Rodriguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Other
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

JSCHNELLER@OMM.COM
213-430-8115
Party name: National Coalition for Child Protection Reform and Professor David Pimentel, Scholar of Parental Rights Law and Child Welfare Law
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein, Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

DW@GOLDSTEINRUSSELL.COM
202-240-8433
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and National Association for Public Defense

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543