Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-846
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-846
Title:Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service, Petitioner
v.
Reginald Kirtz
Docketed:March 7, 2023
Linked with 22A642
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2149)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:November 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2023Application (22A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2023Application (22A642) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 3, 2023.
Mar 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2023 to May 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2023.
May 02 2023Brief of respondent Reginald Kirtz in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023.
May 16 2023Reply of petitioner Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.
Jun 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
Jun 20 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jun 27 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 27 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 15, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 25, 2023.
Aug 15 2023Brief of petitioner Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 6, 2023.
Sep 07 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit.
Sep 15 2023Complete record on appeal from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit received electronically and available with the Clerk.
Sep 18 2023CIRCULATED
Sep 25 2023Brief of respondent Reginald Kirtz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2023Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Reply of petitioner Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2023Argued. For petitioner: Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Nandan M. Joshi, Washington, D. C.
Feb 08 2024Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Benjamin Weisberg
    Counsel of Record
Weisberg Law
7 S. Morton Ave.
Morton, PA 19070

MWEISBERG@WEISBERGLAWOFFICES.COM
6106900801
Party name: Reginald Kirtz
Nandan Maheshchandra JoshiPublic Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

NJOSHI@CITIZEN.ORG
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Reginald Kirtz
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L St. NW
Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

hkieschnick@publicjustice.net
2406203645
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, Public Justice, UC Berkeley Center for Consumer Law & Economic Justice, and the Housing Clinic of Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization at Yale Law School

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543