Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-823
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-823
Title:Alicia Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Janelle Henderson
Docketed:March 1, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(97672-4)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 23, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2023Waiver of right of respondent Janelle Henderson to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Mar 30 2023Response Requested. (Due May 1, 2023)
Mar 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2023Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 01 2023Brief of respondent Janelle Henderson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 08 2023Reply of petitioner Alicia Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 23 2023Rescheduled.
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023.
May 31 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.
Jun 06 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
Jun 13 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 21 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas joins, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

SCOTT@LEHOTSKYKELLER.COM
5126938350
Party name: Alicia Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
David Benjamin Owens
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
PO Box 85110
Seattle, WA 98145

DAVID@LOEVY.COM
3122435900
Party name: Janelle Henderson
Vonda M. SargentThe Law Offices of Vonda M. Sargent
119 1st Ave., S. Ste. # 500
Seattle, WA 98104

sisterlaw@me.com
206-838-4970
Party name: Janelle Henderson
Other
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

LCOBERLY@WINSTON.COM
312-558-5600
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The American Tort Reform Association
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

MFITZGERALD@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
804-775-4716
Party name: National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies (NAMIC)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543