Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-815
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-815
Title:Victor B. Skaar, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:February 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1757, 2021-1812)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2023 to May 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2023.
Mar 29 2023Amicus brief of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium not accepted for filing. (April 03, 2023) (duplicate efiling)
Mar 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2023Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure and Administrative Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2023Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2023.
May 15 2023Brief of respondent Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
May 30 2023Reply of petitioner Victor B. Skaar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 20 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael J. Wishnie
    Counsel of Record
Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization
Veterans Legal Services Clinic
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

MICHAEL.WISHNIE@YALE.EDU
(203) 432-4800
Party name: Victor B. Skaar
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

MBOSTWICK@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8483
Party name: Civil Procedure and Administrative Law Scholars
Paul William Browning
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-4413

PAUL.BROWNING@FINNEGAN.COM
2024084134
Party name: NVLSP, IAVA and VVA
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
The Veterans Clinic at the University of Missouri
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

DRAKEA@MISSOURI.EDU
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM
202-637-3377
Party name: National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543