Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-807
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-807
Title:Thomas C. Alexander, in His Official Capacity as President of the South Carolina Senate, et al., Appellants
v.
The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Docketed:February 27, 2023
Linked with 23A851
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(3:21-cv-03302-MGL-TJH-RMG)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2023Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due March 29, 2023)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2023Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2023Motion to affirm filed by appellees The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Apr 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023.
Apr 12 2023Opposition to motion of Senate Appellants, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 15 2023Probable jurisdiction noted.
May 25 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 7, 2023. The time to file appellees' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2023.
Jul 07 2023Brief of Appellants filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2023Joint appendix filed. (Distributed) (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 14 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 11, 2023.
Jul 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 14 2023Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of Governor Henry McMaster filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023Brief amici curiae of Nancy Mace, Joe Wilson, Jeff Duncan, William Timmons, Ralph Norman, and Russell Fry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023Brief amici curiae of State of Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of Fair Lines America Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Record requested from the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina.
Jul 18 2023Complete record on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina electronically received and available with the Clerk.
Jul 27 2023CIRCULATED
Aug 11 2023Brief of appellees The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2023Supplemental Joint appendix filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Political Science Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2023Brief amici curiae of League of Women Voters of South Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos and Jowei Chen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Congressman James E. Clyburn filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2023Video exhibits from the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina record electronically received and available with the Clerk.
Sep 11 2023Reply of appellant Senate Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 11 2023Argued. For appellants: John M. Gore, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Leah C. Aden, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae: Caroline A. Flynn, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Mar 18 2024Application (23A851) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 21 2024Response to application (23A851) requested by The Chief Justice, due by noon (EDT), on March 25, 2024.
Mar 25 2024Response to application from respondents The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2024Reply of applicants in support of the application for stay filed.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

JMGORE@JONESDAY.COM
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Senate Appellants
Attorneys for Appellees
Leah Camille AdenNAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

LADEN@NAACPLDF.ORG
2129652200
Party name: The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: The South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Brian C. Duffy
    Counsel of Record
Duffy and Young, LLC
96 Broad Street
Charleston, SC 29401

bduffy@duffyandyoung.com
843-720-2044
Party name: League of Women Voters of South Carolina, Gullah Geechee Chamber of Commerce, The Charleston Branch of The Association for the Study of African American Life and History
Phillip Michael Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

pgordon@holtzmanvogel.com
540-341-8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
John David Graubert
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

jgraubert@cov.com
2026625938
Party name: Congressman James E. Clyburn
Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
    Counsel of Record
Election Law Clinic, Harvard Law School
6 Everett St, Suite 4105
Cambridge, MA 02138

rgreenwood@law.harvard.edu
2025600590
Party name: Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos and Jowei Chen
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
William Grayson Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
South Carolina State House
1100 Gervais Street
Columbia, SC 29201

glambert@governor.sc.gov
803-734-2100
Party name: Governor Henry McMaster
Thomas Ashley Limehouse Jr.Office of the Governor, State of South Carolina
1100 Gervais Street
Columbia, SC 29201

TLimehouse@governor.sc.gov
803-734-6023
Party name: Governor Henry McMaster
Angela Marie Liu
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400
Chicago, IL 60601

angela.liu@dechert.com
312-646-5800
Party name: Political Science Professors
Michelle Katz Moriarty
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mmoriarty@proskauer.com
(212) 969-3441
Party name: Historians
T. Russell Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rnobile@judicialwatch.org
202-527-9866
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Richard Bryan Raile
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

rraile@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1711
Party name: Fair Lines America Foundation
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Ste 643-A
Washington, DC 20037

JTORCHINSKY@HOLTZMANVOGEL.COM
202-737-8808
Party name: Nancy Mace, Joe Wilson, Jeff Duncan, William Timmons, Ralph Norman, and Russell Fry
Julie Michelle Veroff
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center, 20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

jveroff@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543