Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-782
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-782
Title:Carol Pulliam, Petitioner
v.
University of Southern California
Docketed:February 17, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B304749)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 8, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 16, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2023Waiver of right of respondent University of Southern California to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 22 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023Petition DENIED.
May 12 2023Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.
Jun 12 2023Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Isaac Fine
    Counsel of Record
Richard I Fine
1187 Coast Village Road
Suite 1, #789
Santa Barbara, CA 93108

RICHARDFINElaw@GMAIL.COM
(310) 622-6900
Party name: Carol Pulliam
Attorneys for Respondent
Lacey L. Estudillo
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy, LLP
505 Sansome Steet, Suite #375
San Francisco, CA 94111-3175

lestudillo@horvitzlevy.com
415-462-5600
Party name: University of Southern California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543