Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-7784
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-7784
Title:Demarcus Donte Ivey, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4296, 18-4297)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:March 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 14, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Jun 16 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 22 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jul 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of North Carolina Advocates for Justice (July 25 2023)filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Patrick McLoughlin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
100 North Tryon Street
Suite 4700
Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

jimmcloughlin@mvalaw.com
704-331-1054
Party name: Demarcus Ivey
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Christopher J. Blake
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
301 Hillsborough Street, Suite 1400
Raleigh, NC 27603

chris.blake@nelsonmullins.com
919-329-3808
Party name: North Carolina Advocates for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543