Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-77 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-77 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:David Brown, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:July 27, 2022
Linked with 21A821
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(16-KA-0998)
   Decision Date:January 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2022Application (21A821) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 23, 2022 to July 23, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Application (21A821) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 23, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2022 to September 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 26, 2022.
Aug 26 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Current and Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2022Brief amici curiae of the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 12 2022Reply of petitioner David Brown filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2022Record Requested.
Jan 10 2023Record received from the Supreme Court of Louisiana (7 boxes).
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023.
Mar 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Mar 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023.
Apr 03 2023Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Current and Former Prosecutors, et al. GRANTED.
Apr 03 2023Petition DENIED. Justice Jackson, with whom Justice Sotomayor and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Apr 06 2023Record returned to the Supreme Court of Louisiana (7 boxes).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

jlfisher@omm.com
(650) 473-2633
Party name: David Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Juliet L. Clark
    Counsel of Record
Assistant District Attorney
200 Derbigny Street
Gretna, LA 70053

jclark@jpda.us
(504)-368-1020
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543