Docket for 22-7648
|
May 10 2023 | Application (22A1009) to file petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | May 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 26, 2023) | | AppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | May 23 2023 | Application (22A1009) to file petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition in excess of page limits granted by Justice Thomas. The petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition may not exceed 49 pages. | | | Jun 01 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jul 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Oct 02 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|