Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-734
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-734
Title:Rafael Gomez-Vargas, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:February 6, 2023
Linked with 22A548
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-60429)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2022Application (22A548) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2023 to February 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Dec 16 2022Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filiing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 21 2022Application (22A548) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 2, 2023.
Feb 02 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2023)
Feb 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2023 to April 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2023.
Mar 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2023 to May 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2023.
May 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
May 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2023.
May 15 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed.
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
May 30 2023Reply of petitioner Rafael Gomez-Vargas filed. (Distributed)
Jun 09 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JSANTOS@GOODWINLAW.COM
202-346-4000
Party name: Rafael Gomez-Vargas
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543